EP2051324 - Polymer electrolyte fuel cell and operation method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hase, Nobuhiro Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kusakabe, Hiroki Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Ohara, Hideo Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Takeguchi, Shinsuke Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Yoshiaki Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Yamazaki, Tatsuto Panasonic Corp. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develop. Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152471.0 | 02.04.2002 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | JP20010104107 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001104107 | JP20010109140 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001109140 | JP20010142791 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001142791 | JP20010179194 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001179194 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051324 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, // H01M8/04 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/0267 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
H01M8/04126 (EP,US);
H01M8/04156 (EP,US);
H01M8/04358 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (EP,KR);
H01M8/2457 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2465 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2484 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04761 (EP,US);
H01M8/04768 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | Polymer-Elektrolyt-Brennstoffzelle und deren Betriebsverfahren | [2009/17] | English: | Polymer electrolyte fuel cell and operation method thereof | [2009/17] | French: | Pile à combustible à électrolyte polymère et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 01.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02708775.8 / EP1357624 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020708775) is 08.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0959511 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0041] , [0057] , [0058]; figures 2A,2B,3,11,12A,12B * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * [Y] 3-6; | [X]US6180273 (OKAMOTO TAKAFUMI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 33 - line 63; figure 2 * * column 3, line 12 - line 20 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 35 *; | [PX]JP2001202984 (TOSHIBA CORP) [PX] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH02168565 (NIPPON SOKEN) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH08138692 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0955686 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] *; | [Y]JPH08130028 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6316577 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1357624 | EP20020708775 |