EP2096594 - Method and system for implementing multiple web services for a service query [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Qi 387 West Squire Drive, Apt 5 Rochester, NY 14623 / US | 02 /
Weng, Fuliang 1479 Lloyd Way Mountain View CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Meng, Yao 1537 Danromas Way San Jose CA 95129 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
Yu, Qi 904 Brightwood Manor Drive, Apt 11 Blacksburg CA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
Weng, Fuliang 1479 Lloyd Way Mountain View CA 94040 / US | |||
03 /
Meng, Yao 1537 Danromas Way San Jose CA 95129 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152630.1 | 12.02.2009 | [2009/36] | Priority number, date | US20080072707 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: US 72707 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2096594 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G06F9/5055 (EP,US);
G06F2209/5015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/18] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Umsetzung von mehreren Webdiensten für eine Dienstanfrage | [2009/36] | English: | Method and system for implementing multiple web services for a service query | [2009/36] | French: | Procédé et système pour la mise en oeuvre de multiples services Web pour une requête de services | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/36] | Procédé et système pour la mise en ýuvre de multiples services Web pour une requête de services | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2015 | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/04] | 15.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.09.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - YU Q ET AL, "Framework for Web service query algebra and optimization", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON THE WEB ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY US, (20080201), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 6.1 - 6.35, XP002523754 [X] 1-15 * page 6.6 - page 6.7; figures 2,3 * * page 6.9 - page 6.10 * * page 6.11; figure 5 * * page 6.16, paragraph 1 * * page 6.20 - page 6.21 * * page 6.23 - page 6.24 * * page 6.29 * * table IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1326561.1326567 | [A] - ESFANDIARI B ET AL, "Towards a Web Service Composition Management Framework", WEB SERVICES, 2005. ICWS 2005. PROCEEDINGS. 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CO NFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 11-15 JULY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050711), ISBN 978-0-7695-2409-2, pages 419 - 426, XP010851830 [A] 1-15 * page 3, column 1 - page 5, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICWS.2005.121 | [A] - QI YU ET AL, "Deploying and managing Web services: issues, solutions, and directions", THE VLDB JOURNAL ; THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON VERY LARGE DATA BASES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20061104), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0949-877X, pages 537 - 572, XP019592957 [A] 1-15 * page 555 - page 557 * * page 563, column 2 - page 564, column 1 * * page 567, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00778-006-0020-3 | [A] - LAMPARTER S ET AL, "Preference-based selection of highly configurable web services", 16TH INTERNATIONAL WORLD WIDE WEB CONFERENCE, WWW2007 - 16TH INTERNATIONAL WORLD WIDE WEB CONFERENCE, WWW2007 2007 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY US, (2007), pages 1013 - 1022, XP002523755 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |