EP2090810 - Diagnostic apparatus and diagnostic method for belt squeezing force adjusting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Yasunari c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Hino, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Toyoda, Shinya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Naoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2013/01] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
Matsui, Yasunari c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Hino, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Toyoda, Shinya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Naoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/01] |
Former [2009/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152649.1 | 12.02.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | JP20080032300 | 13.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008032300 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090810 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090810 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090810 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/66, F16H61/662 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
F16H61/66272 (EP,US);
F16H61/12 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1208 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1268 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1288 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | F16H61/66 | Designated contracting states | DE [2013/01] |
Former [2012/40] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Diagnosevorrichtung und Diagnoseverfahren für Mechanismus zum Einstellen der Bandpresskraft | [2009/34] | English: | Diagnostic apparatus and diagnostic method for belt squeezing force adjusting mechanism | [2009/34] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic et procédé de diagnostic pour mécanisme de réglage de la force de serrage d'une courroie | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19937472 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 4-7; | [A]JP2004316861 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007232424 (NISHIDA MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,3,11 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0058] *; | [AD]JP2006248371 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [AD] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4698764 (INAGAKI TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPS60157553 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1,11 | by applicant | JPS60157553 | JP2006248371 |