Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024150317 | ![]() | 09.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | US201715796615 | 27.10.2017 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US202318118549 | 07.03.2023 | US201916406246 | 08.05.2019 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | US201514805816 | 22.07.2015 | US202017086666 | 02.11.2020 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022033377 | ![]() | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | US201715796615 | 27.10.2017 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US201916406246 | 08.05.2019 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | US201514805816 | 22.07.2015 | US202017086666 | 02.11.2020 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019263782 | ![]() | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | US201715796615 | 27.10.2017 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US201916406246 | 08.05.2019 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | US201514805816 | 22.07.2015 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9815816 | ![]() | 14.11.2017 | B2 | US2016185754 | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | US201514805816 | 22.07.2015 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014378684 | ![]() | 25.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8865899 | ![]() | 21.10.2014 | B2 | US2012095229 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8163926 | ![]() | 24.04.2012 | B2 | US2009203905 | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10344015 | ![]() | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2018118716 | 03.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113314034 | 07.12.2011 | US201715796615 | 27.10.2017 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | US8868008 | 01.12.2008 | US201414481302 | 09.09.2014 | US201514805816 | 22.07.2015 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101307641B | ![]() | 12.09.2013 | B1 | KR20080049114 | 03.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5213715B | ![]() | 19.06.2013 | B2 | JP2009510039 | 12.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL227574 | ![]() | 31.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1943240 | ![]() | 11.11.2009 | B1 | EP1943240 | 16.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006296367B | ![]() | 11.08.2011 | B2 | AU2006296367 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2053048 | ![]() | 21.09.2011 | B8 | EP2053048 | 15.09.2010 | B1 | EP2053048 | 29.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE448218T | 15.11.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0616715 | 28.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2624045 | 22.05.2012 | C | CA2624045 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2745829 | 02.07.2013 | C | CA2745829 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2624045 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101277948B | 13.03.2013 | B | CN101277948 | 01.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1110275T | 14.01.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1110887T | 10.06.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09152654 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010428D1 | 24.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1943240T | 01.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2053048T | 29.11.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1122553 | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20100019T | 28.02.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL190172 | 28.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME01466 | 20.04.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME01531 | 20.04.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | EP09152654 | 27.09.2006 | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO342152B | 03.04.2018 | B1 | NO20081267L | 30.04.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ566566 | 26.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ593930 | 22.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ56656606 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1943240T | 30.04.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2053048T | 31.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09152654 | 27.09.2006 | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS51263 | 31.12.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2006GB03587 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1943240T | 26.02.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06794582 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2053048T | 31.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09152654 | 27.09.2006 | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007036713 | ![]() | 14.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007036713 | 05.04.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5654546B | ![]() | 14.01.2015 | B2 | JP2013063998 | 11.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR055671 | 29.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE481399T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102503898B | 25.03.2015 | B | CN102503898 | 20.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102503933B | 25.06.2014 | B | CN102503933 | 20.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006017004D1 | 28.10.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2335435T | 26.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2350513T | 24.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0519879D0 | 09.11.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1130478 | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20100620T | 31.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY145540 | 29.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY149834 | 31.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1943240E | 11.01.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2053048E | 10.11.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS51515 | 30.06.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2448102 | 20.04.2012 | C2 | RU2008116573 | 10.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG165416 | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI328580B | 11.08.2010 | B | TW200745036 | 16.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI424991B | 01.02.2014 | B | TW201018660 | 16.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY29824 | 30.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200802416 | 28.01.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0519879 | 30.09.2005 | Type | ![]() | EP1943240 |