EP2221907 - Back-up fuel cell electric generator comprising a compact manifold body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/34] | Back-up fuel cell electric generator comprising a compact manifold body, methods of managing the operation thereof | ||
[2011/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electro Power Systems S.p.A. Via Livorno 60 10144 Torino (TO) / IT | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherchi, Pierpaolo Corso Lione, 40 10141 Torino / IT | 02 /
Mercante, Luca Via Adua, 12 10093 Collegno / IT | 03 /
Musso, Andrea Via Sabaudia, 42 10095 Grugliasco / IT | 04 /
Ceffa, Dario Strada della Rovere 34 13900 Biella / IT | 05 /
Borello, Luisa Via Morghen, 9 10143 Torino / IT | 06 /
Gianolio, Giuseppe Via Aldo Moro, 30 14010 Cellarengo / IT | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2011/52] |
Former [2010/34] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09152671.5 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221907 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221907 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/24 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
H01M8/04552 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/04141 (EP,US);
H01M8/04225 (EP,KR);
H01M8/04298 (EP,US);
H01M8/04302 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0432 (EP,US);
H01M8/04432 (EP,US);
H01M8/04544 (EP,US);
H01M8/04664 (EP,US);
H01M8/04761 (EP,US);
H01M8/04768 (EP,US);
H01M8/04925 (EP,US);
H01M8/04932 (US);
H01M8/04955 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M8/24 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Brennstoffzellen-Ersatzgenerator mit einem kompakten Verteilerkörper | [2011/30] | English: | Back-up fuel cell electric generator comprising a compact manifold body | [2011/30] | French: | Générateur électrique de secours à pile à combustible comprenant un corps de collecteur compact | [2011/30] |
Former [2010/34] | Elektrischer Ersatzgenerator für Brennstoffzellen mit einem kompakten Verteilerkörper, Verfahren zur Verwaltung des Betriebs davon | ||
Former [2010/34] | Back-up fuel cell electric generator comprising a compact manifold body, methods of managing the operation thereof | ||
Former [2010/34] | Générateur électrique de secours à pile à combustible comprenant un corps de collecteur compact, procédés de gestion de son fonctionnement | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09179569.0 / EP2226879 | EP09179570.8 / EP2226880 | EP09179574.0 / EP2226881 | EP09179575.7 / EP2226882 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 26.04.2010 | [2010/34] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2009 | AT | 28.12.2011 | BE | 28.12.2011 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MK | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | IE | 12.02.2012 | LU | 12.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 28.03.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | DE | 01.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
LU | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/30] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
DE | 01.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6541148 (WALSH MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] * * column 1, lines 36-49 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 8 * * claim - *; | [A]US6875535 (YE JIANMING [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 52-56 ** column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 13 *; | [A]WO2008087542 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0009] * * figure - * * paragraphs [0066] - [0069] * | by applicant | US6541148 | US6875535 |