EP2096409 - Stitched waveguide for use in a fiber-optic gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feth, John Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
Feth, John Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P. Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09152742.4 | 12.02.2009 | [2009/36] | Priority number, date | US20080040866 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 40866 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2096409 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2096409 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2096409 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72, G02B6/12 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G01C19/721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/22] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehefteter Wellenleiter zur Verwendung in einem faseroptischen Gyroskop | [2009/36] | English: | Stitched waveguide for use in a fiber-optic gyroscope | [2009/36] | French: | Guide d'onde piqué pour une utilisation dans un gyroscope à fibres optiques | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5982964 (MARX JEFFREY M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * claims 1,3,4,6 * * column 2, lines 59-64 * * column 3, lines 17-21 *; | [A]US2004091207 (OHNO ARITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0035] , [0053] *; | [A]US5875276 (MAHAPATRA AMARESH [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 7,9,11,12,15 * * column 10, lines 31,32 * |