EP2091136 - Bearing apparatus of an electric machine and electric rotating machine comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 Rue André Boulle 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Douarin, Michel 40 rue de Fontenay 92330, Sceaux / FR | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 Rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 Rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 09152948.7 | 16.02.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | FR20080051021 | 18.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0851021 | [2009/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091136 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091136 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
H02K19/365 (EP);
H02K5/207 (EP,US);
H02K11/05 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP);
H02K5/1732 (EP);
H02K9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Lagervorrichtung einer elektrischen Maschine und rotierende elektrische Maschine, die eine solche Lagervorrichtung umfasst | [2009/34] | English: | Bearing apparatus of an electric machine and electric rotating machine comprising the same | [2009/34] | French: | Palier de machine électrique tournante et machine électrique tournante comportant un tel palier | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | HR | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | MK | 25.08.2010 | MT | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | NO | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | LU | 16.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
HR | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
NO | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0671804 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]); | [A]US5712517 (SCHMIDT ERIC ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [A]US2006012254 (EINHEUSER GARY M [US], et al); | [A]US2007035188 (MILLER HANS-PETER [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4488070 | EP0515259 | US5315195 | FR2744575 | FR2768261 | WO0169762 | FR2855672 | US7019424 |