EP2093332 - Method for constructing a foundation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Vermeer Business Development B.V. Kruisweg 835 2130 KB Hoofddorp / NL | For all designated states Unidek Group B.V. Scheiweg 26 5421 XL Gemert / NL | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Pol, Johan Willem Dura Vermeer Business Development BV p/a Kruisweg 2130 KB, Hoofddorp / NL | [2012/50] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
Van der Pol, Johan Willem Dura Vermeer Business Development BV p/a Kruisweg 2130 KB, Hoofddorp / NL | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/35] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09153179.8 | 19.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | NL20082001295 | 19.02.2008 Original published format: NL 2001295 | [2009/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093332 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093332 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/06, B63B35/38, E02D27/36 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
E02D27/06 (EP);
E02D27/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Fundamentes | [2009/35] | English: | Method for constructing a foundation | [2009/35] | French: | Méthode de construction d'une fondation | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | AT | 12.12.2012 | BE | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | IE | 19.02.2013 | LU | 19.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GB | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | DE | 03.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GB | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
DE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2174441 (VIDAL HENRI) [X] 1-12 * pages 1-3; figures 3,4 * [Y] 14,15; | [X]WO9739195 (SCREG [FR], et al) [X] 2,3,5,6,9,10,12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2007030013 (VOSKAMP HEIN DOUWINUS [NL]) [Y] 1,15 * pages 7,8; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE476333 (SIEMENS BAUUNION GMBH) [A] 13 * page 1, lines 34-55 *; | [A]DE325700 (ALFRED BLONDEL) [A] 13 * page 1, lines 47-65; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5869923 (KAJIMA CORP) [A] 13 * abstract *; | [A]NL1025707C (ABC ARKENBOUW B V [NL]) [A] 1,15 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO0196671 (PFAHL HUBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3; claims 3,4 *; | [A]EP0683273 (SCREG [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3908005 (AICHER MAX [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE858967 (LORENZ HANS DR-ING) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 97-107; figures 1,4 *; | [A]JP2006152659 (KUMAGAI GUMI CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - "DRAAIBARE WONING DRIJFT OP EPS", BOUWWERELD, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, DOETINCHEM, NL, (20071204), vol. 103, no. 21, ISSN 0026-5942, page 20/21, XP001509294 [Y] 1,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2174441 |