EP2128198 - Process for the preparation of polyamides using carboxylic acids and amides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip Zimmer GmbH Olof-Palme-Strasse 35 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Lurgi Zimmer GmbH Olof-Palme-Str. 35 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Lurgi Zimmer GmbH Lurgiallee 5 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otto, Brigitta, Dr. Bergstraße 6 a 14715 Milow / DE | 02 /
Liehr, Hartmut, Dr. Dorfstraße 32 a 16816 Buskow / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer MD Legal Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hanauer Landstr. 287-289 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Franklinstrasse 46-48 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Patentanwaltskanzlei Mainzer-Landstrasse 69-71 60329 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09153394.3 | 23.02.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | DE20081026075 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008026075 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128198 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128198 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C08K5/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L77/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyamiden unter Verwendung von Carbonsäuren und Amiden | [2009/49] | English: | Process for the preparation of polyamides using carboxylic acids and amides | [2009/49] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyamides en utilisant des acides carboxyliques et des amides | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Uhde Inventa-Fischer GmbH Holzhauser Strasse 157-159 13509 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Uhde Inventa-Fischer GmbH Holzhauser Strasse 157-159 13509 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 27.11.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.03.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.03.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/25] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 21.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T0044/18 | 22.02.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.03.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 12.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2009 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | AT | 23.02.2015 | IE | 23.02.2015 | LU | 23.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | FR | 23.03.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | GB | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | PT | 21.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.02.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.02.2009 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
PT | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GB | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 28.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004068089 (CHARBONNEAUX THIERRY [IT], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * example 1 * * claims 1-4,8,9,12,14,17,18 *; | [I]EP1449872 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * examples 1-4,13,14 * * claims 1-13 *; | [ID]WO2005040262 (RHODIANYL [FR], et al) [ID] 1-12 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 1, line 25 - line 27 * * page 2, column 3 - page 1, column 6 * * page 5, line 3 - line 7 * * page 7, line 7 - line 27 * * page 9, line 1 - line 16 * * examples 1,4,7 * * examples 1,3,11-15 * | by applicant | DE2237849 | DE4403084 | EP0466647 | DE19537614 | DE2040975 | US5618909 | WO2005040262 | EP1675901 | WO2006002187 | EP1773932 | DE19854421 | EP0818491 |