Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8820081 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2012117969 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01129 | 24.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010219134B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2014 | B2 | AU2010219134 | 01.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01129 | 24.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1011382 | 07.07.2020 | B1 | BRPI1011382 | 15.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01129 | 24.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201106072 | 27.02.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01129 | 24.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010097203 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2012 | A3 | WO2010097203 | 02.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2224104 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2012 | B1 | EP2224104 | 01.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE550522T | 15.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011002088 | 03.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2382939T | 14.06.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2224104E | 07.05.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | EP09153976 | 27.02.2009 |