EP2226380 - Enzyme-based fed-batch technique in liquid cultures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioSilta Oy P.O. Box 4300 90014 University of Oulu / FI | [2014/51] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states BioSilta Oy P.O. Box 4300 90014 University of Oulu / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neubauer, Peter Frohnauer Strasse 59 13467 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Neubauer, Antje Frohnauer Strasse 59 13467 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Vasala, Antti Nokkalantie 39 A19 90500 Oulu / FI | [2014/51] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
Neubauer, Peter Frohnauer Strasse 59 13467 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Neubauer, Antje Frohnauer Strasse 59 13467 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Vasala, Antti Nokkalantie 39 A19 90500 Oulu / FI | Representative(s) | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2013/11] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al PATRONUS IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Truderinger Straße 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Ganahl, Bernhard Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09154440.3 | 05.03.2009 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226380 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226380 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/22, C12P21/02 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C12N1/22 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Fed-Batch-Technik auf Enzymbasis in Flüssigkeitskulturen | [2010/36] | English: | Enzyme-based fed-batch technique in liquid cultures | [2010/36] | French: | Technique d'écoulement continu enzymatique dans des cultures liquides | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2009 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | IE | 05.03.2015 | LU | 05.03.2015 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.03.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | HR | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US3926723 (GREEN HOWARD, et al) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [ID]WO2008065254 (OULUN YLIOPISTO [FI], et al) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03066826 (GENENCOR INT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 22,23,43 *; | [A]WO0125467 (COGNIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 3 * | [XI] - ASENJO J A ET AL, "Optimal control of batch processes involving simultaneous enzymatic and microbial reactions", BIOPROCESS ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0178-515X, pages 323 - 329, XP002538161 [X] 1-4,7-8,11 * the whole document * [I] 5-6,9-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00369477 | [XI] - ASENJO J A ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF BATCH PROCESSES INVOLVING SIMULTANEOUS ENZYMATIC AND MICROBIAL REACTIONS", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 37, no. 11, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1087 - 1094, XP002538162 [X] 1-4,7-8,11 * the whole document * [I] 5-6,9-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260371114 | Examination | - PANULA-PERÃ LÃ JOHANNA ET AL, "Enzyme controlled glucose auto-delivery for high cell density cultivations in microplates and shake flasks", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, NL, (20081118), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2859-7-31, ISSN 1475-2859, page 31, XP021043554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-7-31 | by applicant | WO2006119867 | US3926723 | - CINAR A. ET AL., Batch fermentation - modeling, monitoring, and control, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (2003), page 5 | - LULI W. R.; W. R. STROHL, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 56, pages 1004 - 1011 | - RIESENBERG D. ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 20, pages 17 - 28 | - CRABTREE H. G., J. BIOCHEM., (1928), vol. 22, pages 1289 - 1298 | - RINAS U. ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1989), vol. 31, pages 163 - 167 | - MONOD J., ACTUALITES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES, (1942), vol. 911, pages 70 - 78 | - KLEMAN G. L.; STROHL W. R., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 5, pages 180 - 186 | - RIESENBERG D., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 2, pages 380 - 384 | - LONGBARDI G. P., BIOPROC. ENGIN., (1994), vol. 10, pages 185 - 194 | - LEE S. Y, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 98 - 105 | - LUBBE C. ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1985), vol. 22, pages 424 - 427 | - JEUDE M. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 95, pages 433 - 445 | - PANULA-PERÄLÄ J. ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 131, page S182 | - PANULA-PERÄLÄ ET AL., MICROB. CELL FACT., (2008), vol. 7, page 31 | - TOKUDA M. ET AL., J. FERMENT. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 85, pages 495 - 501 | - NEUBAUER P. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1995), vol. 47, pages 139 - 146 | - HOLME T. ET AL., PROCESS BIOCHEM., (1970), vol. 5, pages 62 - 66 | - HOLME T ET AL., PROCESS BIOCHEM., (1970), vol. 5, pages 62 - 66 | - SOINI J. ET AL., MICROB. CELL FACT., (2008), vol. 7, page 26 |