|
19.11.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.07.2013 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
16.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
22 |