27.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
21.11.2014 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
19.03.2014 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
20.02.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
21.11.2012 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
11.09.2012 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.04.2012 |
Opposition filed |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
02.03.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
10.06.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
06.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.06.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
08.04.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
28.01.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
24.01.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2010 |
First examination report |
|
09.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
02.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
26.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.09.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
21.08.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |