EP2101221 - Toner manufacturing method, toner manufacturing apparatus, and toner manufactured by the toner manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norikane, Yoshihiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Shinji Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Sonoda, Tetsuya Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Uchida, Keisuke Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09154631.7 | 09.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | JP20080059169 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008059169 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101221 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, B01J2/04, B05B5/025, B05B17/06 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
G03G9/0804 (EP,US);
B01J2/04 (EP,US);
B01J2/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/20] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tonerherstellungsverfahren, Tonerherstellungsvorrichtung und Toner, der durch das Tonerherstellungsverfahren hergestellt wird | [2009/38] | English: | Toner manufacturing method, toner manufacturing apparatus, and toner manufactured by the toner manufacturing method | [2009/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de toner, appareil de fabrication de toner, et toner fabriqué par le procédé de fabrication de toner | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1978411 (RICOH KK [JP]) [PX] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0024]; claim - *; | [D]JP2008276146 (RICOH KK); | [PX]EP1992995 (RICOH KK [JP]) [PX] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0031]; claim - *; | [PAX]EP1992993 (RICOH KK [JP]) [PA] 1-12 * paragraph [0050] *[PX] 13-15 | by applicant | JPS57201248 | JPH07152202 | JP3786034B | JP3786035B | JP2008276146 |