EP2065052 - Anti-IgE vaccines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis P LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Zoetis P LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | ||
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states PAH USA 15 LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | ||
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morsey, Mohamad Ali Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
Sheppard, Michael George Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 03 /
Wheeler, David Walter Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Mannion, Sally Kim, et al Zoetis UK Limited Walton Oaks Dorking Road Tadworth Surrey KT20 7NS / GB | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/17] | Mannion, Sally Kim Pfizer Animal Health Walton Oaks Dorking Road Tadworth, Surrey KT20 7NS / GB | ||
Former [2012/33] | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2009/23] | Ricol, David Gerard, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09154655.6 | 24.08.2001 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | US20000228989P | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 228989 P | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2065052 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2065052 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, C07K16/00, A61K39/395 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
Y10S424/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S530/868 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/0008, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | Anti-IgE Vakzine | [2009/23] | English: | Anti-IgE vaccines | [2009/23] | French: | Anti-IgE vaccins | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2013 | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/13] | 15.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 04.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01307247.5 / EP1195161 | Divisional application(s) | EP10183753.2 / EP2361635 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010307247) is 10.11.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8800204 (RESEARCH CORP [GB]); | [X]WO9305810 (HELLMAN LARS T [SE]); | [X]WO9824808 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [X]US5965709 (PRESTA LEONARD G [US], et al); | [X]WO9967293 (UNITED BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0023477 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB], et al); | by applicant | EP0263655 | US4980286 | WO9206180 | WO9220316 | WO9222635 | WO9314188 | WO9320221 | WO9408598 | WO9412649 | US5436146 | US5601821 | US5653980 | WO9731948 |