Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | BE | Lapse: 31.03.2018 | BG | Lapse: 13.03.2018 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | CZ | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | EE | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | ES | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | FI | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 14.03.2018 | HU | | IE | | IS | Lapse: 13.04.2018 | IT | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | LI | | LT | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | LU | Lapse: 08.03.2018 | MC | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | NL | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | PL | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | PT | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | RO | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | SE | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | SI | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | SK | Lapse: 13.12.2017 | TR | | Examination procedure | 02.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | European patent granted | 13.12.2017 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 12.08.2009 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1730172 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 12.08.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 17.03.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20100209 | | Event date: | 07.04.2010 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20100309 | | Event date: | 21.04.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.08.2017 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20170705 | | Event date: | 13.12.2017 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 13.12.2017 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1730172 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 13.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 954259 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20171215 | | Event date: | 10.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 15.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 18.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602005053233 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 12.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 25.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 18.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 30.04.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 30.04.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 30.04.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 15.05.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 954259 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.05.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180313 | | Event date: | 31.05.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180314 | | Event date: | 27.06.2018 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD FOUND ADMISSIBLE | Filing DATE: | 20180516 | Effective DATE: | 20180627 | | Event date: | 29.06.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20180410 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20180412 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180413 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 10.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180331 | | Event date: | 31.12.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180308 | | Event date: | 28.02.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 28.02.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180331 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20190306 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20190226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20171213 | | Event date: | 01.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602005053233 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 16.05.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R061 602005053233 DE | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO | | Event date: | 27.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 602005053233 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Event date: | 31.03.2021 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20200308 | | Event date: | 10.11.2017 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 06.11.2017 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 04.07.2017 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 01.07.2016 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 01.07.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 10.07.2009 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 27.05.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED BY PROPRIETOR | | Event date: | 27.05.2018 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED BY PATENT HOLDER | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR6 | | Event date: | 25.05.2018 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED ON REQUEST OF PROPRIETOR | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009220 | | Event date: | 23.05.2018 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR REVOCATION FILED BY PATENT HOLDER | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR1 | | Event date: | 23.05.2018 | | Event description: | KIND OF REQUEST FOR REVOCATION RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR2 | | Event date: | 23.05.2018 | | Event description: | DECISION ON REQUEST FOR REVOCATION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNRVR3 | |