EP2100938 - Electrochromic compound, electrochromic composition and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Shigenobu Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Shibuya, Takeshi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Hiroshi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Yuki Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Abe, Yukiko Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Yashiro, Tohru Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09154746.3 | 10.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | JP20080061622 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061622 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100938 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09K9/02, G02F1/15 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
G02F1/1516 (EP);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2010/20] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrochrome Verbindung, elektrochrome Zusammensetzung und Anzeigevorrichtung | [2009/38] | English: | Electrochromic compound, electrochromic composition and display device | [2009/38] | French: | Composé électrochromique, composition électrochromique et dispositif d'affichage | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04320482 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9415246 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al) [Y] 5 * page 3; example - *; | [DA]JP2004151265 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1887416 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * pages 3-4; example -; compounds 31,93 * [Y] 4,5 | by applicant | JPS6271934 | JP2001510590 | JP2002328401 | JP2003161964 | JP2004151265 | JP2004520621 | JP2004536344 | JP2004361514 | JP2006071767 |