EP2104298 - Method of processing data in an internet protocol television system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Joon Hui LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP, 16 Woomyeon-dong, Seocho-gu 137-724, Seoul / KR | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09154804.0 | 10.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | US20080038423P | 21.03.2008 Original published format: US 38423 P | US20080042255P | 03.04.2008 Original published format: US 42255 P | KR20090003308 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: KR 20090003308 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104298 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/1016 (EP);
H04L65/1104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Daten in einem Internetprotokoll-Fernsehsystem | [2009/39] | English: | Method of processing data in an internet protocol television system | [2009/39] | French: | Procédé de traitement de données dans un système de télévision de protocole Internet | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 08.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007093126 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | EP1988666 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0087] - [0117]; figure 6 *; | [PX]EP2031828 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-13 * paragraphs [0056] - [0064] *; | [Y] - "Broadcast and On-line Services: Search, select, and rightful use of content on personal storage systems ( TV-anytime); Part 4: Phase 1 - Content referencing; ETSI TS 102 822-4", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20071101), vol. BC, no. V1.3.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040520 [Y] 1-13 * section 4 - 12 * | [Y] - OPEN IPTV FORUM, "Open IPTV Forum Functional Architecture V 1.1", INTERNET CITATION, (20080115), page COMPLETE, URL: http://www.openiptvforum.org/docs/OpenIPTV-Functional_Architecture-V1_1-2008-01-15_APPROVED.pdf, (20081201), XP007906507 [Y] 1-13 * section 6.4 * | [A] - MIKOCZY E ET AL, "IMS based IPTV services - Architecture and Implementation", MOBIMEDIA - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS; [ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDING SERIES], ICST (INSTITUTE FOR COMPUTER SCIENCES, SOCIAL-INFORMATICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING) ICST, BRU, (20070801), ISBN 978-963-06-2670-5, pages 1 - 7, XP007908230 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007093126 | US20090038423 | US20090042255 |