EP2100712 - Device and method for heating preforms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/38] | Device for heating containers | ||
[2016/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senn, Konrad Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2016/34] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
Senn, Konrad Fischgässel 4 93047 Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2016/45] |
Former [2009/38] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09154945.1 | 12.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | DE20081014215 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008014215 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2100712 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2100712 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100712 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/08, B29C49/12, B29C49/36, // B29C49/64, H05B6/64, B29C35/04, B29C49/06, B29K67/00 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
B29C49/6445 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2035/046 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2049/7862 (EP);
B29C49/12 (EP,CN,US);
B29C49/36 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | B29C35/08, // B29C49/64, H05B6/64, B29C35/04, B29C49/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erwärmen von Vorformlingen | [2016/09] | English: | Device and method for heating preforms | [2016/09] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de chauffage de préforms | [2016/09] |
Former [2009/38] | Vorrichtung zum Erwärmen von Behältnissen | ||
Former [2009/38] | Device for heating containers | ||
Former [2009/38] | Dispositif de chauffage de récipients | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2016 | 15.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2009 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | AT | 12.03.2017 | GB | 12.03.2017 | IE | 12.03.2017 | LU | 12.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.03.2009 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
AT | 12.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.03.2009 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
AT | 12.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.03.2009 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
AT | 12.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
AT | 12.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
AT | 12.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GB | 12.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4411610 (POPPE WASSILY [US], et al) [Y] 7,13 * column 2, line 33 - line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4795871 (STRATTAN ROBERT D [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 5, line 6 - line 23 * * figure 1a *; | [XY]JPH09295342 (KISHIMOTO AKIRA) [X] 1,4,5,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,13; | [A]DE19633467 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 45 - line 48 *; | [XY]EP0860265 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 14, line 29 - line 39 * * column 15, line 8 - line 12 * * column 17, line 16 - line 19 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,10; | [Y]EP1155798 (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY RES COR [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0003] , [0038] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1384563 (AUTOBAR PACKAGING FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0048] *; | [XY]EP1777053 (GRAHAM PACKAGING PET TECH [US]) [X] 1,6,8,9,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0079] - [0081] * * figure 14 * [Y] 2,3,10 | by applicant | DE3020150 | US5718853 | EP1366886 |