EP2135656 - Method for production of purified (Meth)acrylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briegel, Keith, F. c/o Dow Research 727 Norristown Road Spring House, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
Decourcy, Michael, S. 15411 Pinenut Bay Court Houston, TX 77059 / US | 03 /
Elder, James, E. 5643 Dumfries Drive Houston, TX 77096 / US | 04 /
Juliette, Jamie, Jerrick 835 Rolling Run Court Houston, TX 77062 / US | 05 /
Mendoza, Joy, Lyndon 1602 Crescent Shores Lane Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09155448.5 | 18.03.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | US20080130347P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130347 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135656 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/36, C07C51/46, C07C51/50, C07C57/04 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C07C51/46 (EP,KR,US);
C07C51/50 (EP,US);
C07C57/04 (KR);
B01D3/36 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/46, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/50, C07C57/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2010/35] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gereinigter (Meth)-Acrylsäure | [2009/52] | English: | Method for production of purified (Meth)acrylic acid | [2009/52] | French: | Procédé de production d'acide (méth)acrylique purifié | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5371280 (HARAMAKI HIDEFUMI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10 * examples 1.21,1.24,2.19,3.1-3.7,comparative,example,3.1 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 2 * * column 17, lines 59-62 * * column 29, lines 1-5 *; | [A]US2001003783 (NISHIMURA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0044] *; | [A]EP1298120 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0030] *; | [AD]US2004011638 (LEPIZZERA STEPHANE [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2006074257 (BASS STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] *; | [AD]US2007167650 (ISHIKAWA MASARU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] * | by applicant | US3798264 | GB2146636 | US5371280 | US5856568 | US6399817 | US6441228 | US6482981 | US6646161 | US2004011638 | US2007167650 |