EP2189845 - Compositions and processes for photolithography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Deyan 68 Laurel Drive Hudson, MA 01749 / US | 02 /
Xu, Cheng-Bai 7 Davis Road Southboro, MA 01772 / US | 03 /
Barclay, George G. 1566 Main Street Jefferson, MA 01522 / US | 04 /
Wu, Chunyi 7 Beths Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
Wang, Deyan 68 Laurel Drive Hudson, MA 01749 / US | ||
02 /
Xu, Cheng-Bai 7 Davis Road Southboro, MA 01772 / US | |||
03 /
Barclay, George G. 1566 Main Street Jefferson, MA 01522 / US | |||
04 /
Wu, Chunyi 7 Beths Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2017/31] |
Former [2010/21] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09155452.7 | 18.03.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20080116288P | 19.11.2008 Original published format: US 116288 P | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189845 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189845 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189845 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, G03F7/039 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/0046 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0397 (US);
G03F7/0757 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
G03F7/202 (KR);
G03F7/2041 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | G03F7/004, G03F7/039, G03F7/038, G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/31] |
Former [2011/13] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und Prozesse für Fotolithographie | [2010/21] | English: | Compositions and processes for photolithography | [2010/21] | French: | Compositions et procédés de photolithographie | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/13] | GB | 18.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1684120 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]); | [X]EP1720072 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]); | [X]EP1764652 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [X]EP1767992 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [X]US2008118860 (HARADA YUJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2008268376 (IRIE MAKIKO [JP]); | [E]EP2056162 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]); | [E]EP2090598 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | Examination | WO2008123560 | by applicant | EP0164248 | EP0232972 | US4983492 | US5128232 | US5130410 | US5216111 | US5492793 | US5529880 | EP0783136 | EP0829766 | US5843624 | EP0930542 | US5929176 | US6042997 | US6048664 | US6048662 | US6057083 | EP1008913 | US6090526 | US6136501 | WO03077029 | US6680159 | US6692888 | US6803171 | US2006246373 | EP19960118111 | US19980143462 | WO1999US21912 | US20000567634 | WO2001US14914 |