EP2189846 - Process for photolithography applying a photoresist composition comprising a block copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/21] | Compositions comprising block polymer and processes for photolithography | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Deyan / 68 Laurel Drive Hudson, MA 01749 / US | 02 /
Szmanda, Charles R. / 4 Crossman Avenue Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 03 /
Barclay, George G. / 1566 Main Street Jefferson, MA 01522 / US | 04 /
Xu, Cheng-Bai / 7 Davis Road Southboro, MA 01772 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
Wang, Deyan 68 Laurel Drive Hudson, MA 01749 / US | ||
02 /
Szmanda, Charles R. 4 Crossman Avenue Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
03 /
Barclay, George G. 1566 Main Street Jefferson, MA 01522 / US | |||
04 /
Xu, Cheng-Bai 7 Davis Road Southboro, MA 01772 / US | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2015/17] |
Former [2010/21] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09155457.6 | 18.03.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20080199696P | 19.11.2008 Original published format: US 199696 P | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189846 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189846 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/038, G03F7/039, G03F7/20 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/0046 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/038 (US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/0048 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/17] |
Former [2011/05] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Fotolithographie unter Verwendung einer Fotolackzusammensetzung beinhaltend ein Blockcopolymer | [2014/45] | English: | Process for photolithography applying a photoresist composition comprising a block copolymer | [2014/45] | French: | Procédé de photolithographie ultilisant une composition de photoréserve contenant un copolymère à blocs | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/21] | Zusammensetzungen mit einem Blockpolymer und Verfahren für die Fotolithografie | ||
Former [2010/21] | Compositions comprising block polymer and processes for photolithography | ||
Former [2010/21] | Compositions comportant un polymère en bloc et procédés de photolithographie | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0564918 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 8,11,12* examples 1,2,5,6,9; claim 1 *; | [X]US5529880 (ZAMPINI ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 8,12 * examples 35-37,56,60 *; | [X]EP0864927 (JSR CORP [JP]) [X] 8,11-13 * examples 1-3,8-11; claim 1; tables 1,4 *; | [X]WO2008021291 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 3 * * page 5, line 18 - page 8, line 22 * * examples 2,6; claims 1-12 * | by applicant | EP0164248 | EP0232972 | US4983492 | US5128232 | US5130410 | US5216111 | US5492793 | US5529880 | EP0783136 | EP0829766 | US5843624 | EP0930542 | US5929176 | US6042997 | US6048664 | US6048662 | US6057083 | EP1008913 | US6090526 | US6379874 | US6515088 | WO03077029 | US6680159 | US6692888 | US6803171 | US2006246373 | - BURNETT ET AL., J. VAC. SCI. TECHN. B, vol. 23, no. 6, pages 2721 - 2727 | EP19960118111 | US19980143462 | US20000567634 | WO2001US14914 |