EP2127696 - Digital tomosynthesis in robotic stereotactic radiosurgery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 51, Valley Stream Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bani-Hashemi, Ali-Reza 160 Del Monte Drive Wallnut Creek, CA 94595 / US | 02 /
Maltz, Jonathan S. 275 Fairmount Ave. No.7 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09155464.2 | 18.03.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | US20080130136 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130136 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127696 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/4452 (EP,US);
A61B6/4458 (EP,US);
A61B6/04 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Digitale Tomosynthese in der stereotaktischen robotergesteuerten Radiochirurgie | [2013/11] | English: | Digital tomosynthesis in robotic stereotactic radiosurgery | [2009/49] | French: | Tomosynthèse numérique en radiochirurgie stéréotaxique robotique | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/49] | Digitale Tomosynthese in der stereotaktische Roboterfunkchirurgie | Examination procedure | 31.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006124434 (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 4A,4B *; | [A]EP1428473 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * claim 10 * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 45 - line 49 * |