EP2107025 - Yarn winding device and automatic winder comprising yarn winding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6018326 / JP | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoi, Akihiro c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., 136 Takeda Mukaishiro Kyoto Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
Kino, Yoshihiro c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., 136 Takeda Mukaishiro Kyoto Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2013/19] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Itoi, Akihiro c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., 136 Takeda Mukaishiro Kyoto Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
Kino, Yoshihiro c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., 136 Takeda Mukaishiro Kyoto Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Liedl, Christine Hansmann & Vogeser Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Liedl, Christine Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Roßhaupter-Straße 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09155645.6 | 19.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | JP20080089627 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008089627 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107025 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107025 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107025 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H59/10, B65H51/22, B65H63/06, B65H67/08, B65H69/06 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B65H51/22 (EP);
B65H59/10 (EP);
B65H63/062 (EP);
B65H67/081 (EP);
B65H69/06 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | B65H51/22, B65H63/06, B65H67/08, B65H69/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2012/02] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Garnwickelvorrichtung und automatischer Wickler mit einer Garnwickelvorrichtung | [2009/41] | English: | Yarn winding device and automatic winder comprising yarn winding device | [2009/41] | French: | Dispositif de bobinage de fil et enrouleur automatique comportant un dispositif de bobinage de fil | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 05.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11174044.5 / EP2377793 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006058582 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * pages 14-15; figures 2,3 * [Y] 8-10; | [Y]DE10046602 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0277717 (TORAY ENG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 8-10 * column 3, lines 33-53; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0004781 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [A] 8-10 * figure 1; claims 1,3 * | by applicant | JP2004156186 | US3314621 |