EP2063593 - Partial response receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stojanovic, Vladimir, M. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Horowitz, Marc, A. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
Zerbe, Jared, L. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
Bessios, Anthony Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 05 /
Ho, Andrew, C., C. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 06 /
Wei, Jason, C. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 07 /
Tsang, Grace Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 08 /
Garlepp, Bruno, W. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Stojanovic, Vladimir, M. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Horowitz, Marc, A. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
Zerbe, Jared, L. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
04 /
Bessios, Anthony Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
05 /
Ho, Andrew, C., C. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
06 /
Wei, Jason, C. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
07 /
Tsang, Grace Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
08 /
Garlepp, Bruno, W. Rambus Inc. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn.: Ms. Ann William Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2009/28] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Jochen Ehlers Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09155838.7 | 09.04.2004 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | US20030461729P | 09.04.2003 Original published format: US 461729 P | US20030662872 | 16.09.2003 Original published format: US 662872 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063593 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063593 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063593 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/06, H04L7/033 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H04L25/497 (EP,US);
H04L25/03057 (US);
H04L25/03885 (EP);
H04L25/061 (EP);
H04L25/063 (EP,US);
H04L7/0276 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Partialantwortempfänger | [2009/22] | English: | Partial response receiver | [2009/22] | French: | Récepteur à réponse partielle | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2014 | 05.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04759335.5 / EP1618597 | Divisional application(s) | EP10175167.5 / EP2259519 | EP15169337.1 / EP2945335 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040759335) is 01.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2004 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.04.2004 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | by applicant | WO2004093144 |