EP2077127 - Stent coatings containing HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states ev3 Peripheral, Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pathak, Chandrashekhar 16110 Braesgate Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | 02 /
Akella, Rama c/o ev3 Peripheral Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | 03 /
Ranieri, John c/o ev3 Peripheral Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | [2013/41] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
Pathak, Chandrashekhar 16110 Braesgate Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | ||
02 /
Akella, Rama c/o ev3 Peripheral Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | |||
03 /
Ranieri, John c/o ev3 Peripheral Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | |||
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Pathak, Chandrashekhar 16110 Braesgate Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | ||
02 /
Akella, Rama 8811 Spiltarrow Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | |||
03 /
Ranieri, John c/o ev3 Peripheral Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/01] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2009/28] | Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09155994.8 | 06.08.2002 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | US20010991235 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: US 991235 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077127 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2077127 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077127 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/08, A61L31/16 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61L31/125 (US);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61L2/16 (US);
A61L2/28 (US);
A61L31/048 (US);
A61L31/049 (US);
A61L31/06 (US);
A61L31/08 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/434 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US);
A61L2300/802 (US);
A61L2420/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | Stentbeschichtungen mit HMG-CoA-Reduktasehemmern | [2009/28] | English: | Stent coatings containing HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors | [2009/28] | French: | Revêtements d'endoprothèses contenant des inhibiteurs de la HMG-CoA réductase | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02763417.9 / EP1438084 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020763417) is 24.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
SE | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0062614 (NITROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [E]WO03035134 (SULZER BIOLOG INC [US]) [E] 1-8* the whole document *; | [E]WO03039612 (DSB INVEST HOLDING SA [LU], et al) [E] 1-3,5-7 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 10 - line 16 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 3 * |