EP2119372 - Aroma compositions and preparations containing N-alpha-beta-alanyl-dipeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ley, Jakob Peter, Dr. Schubertstr. 5a 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
van den Bos, Christiaan Paradiesweg 8 37671 Höxter / DE | 03 /
Krammer, Gerhard, Dr. Wagnerstr. 4 37603 Holzminden / DE | 04 /
Hofmann, Thomas, Prof. Dr. Malvenweg 23 85375 Neufahrn Mintraching / DE | 05 /
Dunkel, Andreas Angerstr. 14 85354 Freising / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156012.8 | 24.03.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | DE20081024206 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008024206 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119372 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/227, A23L1/226 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A23L27/21 (EP);
A23L27/20 (EP);
A23L27/2028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/29] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aromakompositionen und Zubereitungen umfassend N-alpha-beta-Alanyl-Dipeptide | [2009/47] | English: | Aroma compositions and preparations containing N-alpha-beta-alanyl-dipeptides | [2009/47] | French: | Compositions d'arôme et préparations comprenant des N-alpha-béta-alanyl-dipeptides | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2010/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11215967 (OGAWA KORYO CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007119741 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO2004091497 (NATURAL ALTERNATIVES INTERNAT [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11,12,14,15 * page 6, line 13 - line 18; claim 13 *; | [DA] - TADA M ET AL, "L-Ornithyltaurine, a new salty peptide", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19841001), vol. 32, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 992 - 996, XP002230799 [DA] 1,8,12,14,15 * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00125a009 | [A] - SCHIFFMAN S S ET AL, "Taste of dipeptides", PHYSIOLOGY AND BEHAVIOR, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., OXFORD, GB, vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0031-9384, (19760901), pages 523 - 535, (19760901), XP024305002 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9384(76)90117-7 | [DA] - SCHMIDT B F ET AL, "PEPTIDE-LINKED 1,3-DIALKYL-3-ACYLTRIAZENES: GASTRIN RECEPTOR DIRECTED ANTINEOPLASTIC ALKYLATING AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19940101), vol. 37, no. 22, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3812 - 3817, XP002949122 [DA] 1,11,14 * Scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00048a016 | by applicant | EP0181421 | WO2006114918 | RU2286071 | WO2006066716 | US3159585 | US3971852 | US4532145 | US5124162 | - SHI, H.; HO, C.-T., Flavor of Meat and meat products, (1994), pages 52 - 70 | - GASSER, U.; GROSCH, W., Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1990), vol. 190, pages 3 - 8 | - KIRIMURA, J. ET AL., "The Contribution of Peptides and Amino Acids to the Taste of Foodstuffs", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1969), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 689 - 695 | - DUNKEL, A.; KOESTER, J.; HOFMANN, T., "Molecular and Sensory Characterization of y-Glutamyl Peptides as Key Contributors to the Kokumi Taste of Edible Beans", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2007), vol. 55, no. 16, pages 6712 - 6719 | - SUZUKI, H.; KATO, K.; KUMAGAI, H., "Enzymatic synthesis of gammaglutamylvaline to improve the bitter taste of valine", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2004), vol. 52, pages 577 - 580 | - BELITZ; GROSCH; SCHIEBERLE, Lehrbuch der Lebensmittelchemie, SPRINGER, (2001), page 36F | - MATSUOKA, M.; NAKAJIMA, T.; SANO, "Identification of alpha-(beta-alanyl-)lysine in rabbit muscle; Biochimica et Biophysica Acta", GENERAL SUBJECTS, (1969), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 169 - 171 | - STUTZ, M.W.; SAVAGE, J.E.; O'DELL, B.L., "Identification of ß-alanyl-Iysine in chick muscle", POULTRY SCIENCE, (1971), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 887 - 889 | - TADA, M.; SHINODA, 1.; OKAI, H., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1984), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 992 - 996 | - SCHMIDT, B.F. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, no. 22, pages 3812 - 3818 | - KERLER J.; GROSCH W., "Character impact odorants of boiled chicken: Changes during refrigerated storage and reheating", Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1997), vol. 205, pages 232 - 238 |