EP2105242 - Method for measuring at least one through-hole in at least the first surface of a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kriegmair, Josef Prisostraße 9 85465 Langenpreising / DE | [2009/40] | Application number, filing date | 09156235.5 | 26.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | DE20081016026 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008016026 | [2009/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105242 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/42, B23K26/38 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
B23K26/60 (EP,US);
B23K26/389 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vermessen wenigstens einer Bohrung in zumindest einer ersten Oberfläche eines Bauteils | [2009/40] | English: | Method for measuring at least one through-hole in at least the first surface of a component | [2009/40] | French: | Procédé de mesure d'au moins un forage dans au moins une première surface d'un composant | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0199961 (AE PLC [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XYI]GB2345455 (M J TECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-2,4-7 * abstract * * page 6 - page 8; figure - * [Y] 3 [I] 8-15; | [Y]DE10335657 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD BADEN [CH]) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2008119549 (SAUER GMBH LASERTEC [DE], et al) [XP] 1-2,4-7 * abstract * | Examination | DE102005042270 | by applicant | WO2007028355 |