EP2110349 - Method and device for stacking packaged food slices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hochland Natec Gmbh Kolpingstrasse 32 88178 Heimenkirch / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeuschner, Roland Aufreute 1 88260 Argenbühl / DE | 02 /
Biggel, Andreas Schwarzensee 3 1/2 88145 Hergatz / DE | 03 /
Rupp, Ottmar Sägenweiher 5 88260 Argenbühl / DE | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich, et al Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich, et al Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Mörsenbroicher Weg 191 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156357.7 | 26.03.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | DE20081019028 | 15.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008019028 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110349 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110349 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/32 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
B65G57/32 (EP,US);
B65B35/50 (EP,US);
B65B25/068 (EP,US);
B65B35/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stapeln verpackter Lebensmittelscheiben | [2009/43] | English: | Method and device for stacking packaged food slices | [2009/43] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour empiler des paquets d'aliments en tranche | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HR | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | MK | 27.10.2010 | MT | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | NO | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | LU | 26.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MK | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MK | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MK | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MK | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4450949 (BUSCHOR JOSEF J [US], et al) [X] 5,6,9,10 * column 2, lines 45-50 * * column 3, lines 16-19 * * column 3, lines 33-53 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3642123 (THURNE GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * abstract *; | [X]EP0654407 (CASSOLI MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE C [IT]) [X] 5,6* column 2, lines 8,9; figure 1 *; | [A]US6098782 (HARDAGE TIM W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 5, line 41; figure 1 * |