EP2107653 - Surface Emitting Laser Element Array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kageyama, Takeo The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
Takaki, Keishi The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
Tsukiji, Naoki The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
Iwai, Norihiro The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
Shimizu, Hitoshzi The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 06 /
Kawakita, Yasumasa The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 07 /
Imai, Suguru The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/06] | Patentship Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Vorhoelzerstraße 21 81477 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Kleimann, Tobias Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156442.7 | 27.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | JP20080094026 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008094026 | [2009/41] | Previously filed application, date | JP20080094026 | 31.03.2008 | [2009/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107653 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107653 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/42, H01S5/183 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
H01S5/0422 (EP,US);
H01S5/18311 (EP,US);
H01S5/18341 (EP,US);
H01S5/18369 (EP,US);
H01S5/3054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2013/02] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oberflächenemittierendes Laserelementarray | [2009/41] | English: | Surface Emitting Laser Element Array | [2009/41] | French: | Réseau laser à emission par la surface | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 03.11.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1051075 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,8 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0034] * [I] 6; | [X]JPH10229250 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0043] *; | [XI]EP0935322 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] - [0024] - [0029]; figures 2,3 *[I] 6; | [X]US2006109883 (LEWIS ALAN [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figure 2a * | by applicant | JPH11261174 | US7061956 |