EP2108647 - Bromination process of 3-alkylthiophenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saltigo GmbH Katzbergstrasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinhaus, Antje / Gellertstrasse 22 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
Martin, Andreas / Luisenstrasse 35 51399 Burscheid / DE | 03 /
Broda, Witold / Rengerter Strasse 41 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
Hieronymi, Antje Gellertstrasse 22 50733 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
Martin, Andreas Luisenstrasse 35 51399 Burscheid / DE | |||
03 /
Broda, Witold Rengerter Strasse 41 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | Representative(s) | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP-IPR LANXESS Tower Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156562.2 | 30.03.2009 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | DE20081018485 | 11.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008018485 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108647 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108647 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/28 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
C07D333/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bromierung von Alkylthiophenen | [2009/42] | English: | Bromination process of 3-alkylthiophenes | [2009/42] | French: | Procédé pour la bromuration de 3-alkylthiophènes | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2009 | CY | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | LU | 30.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.03.2009 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
LU | 30.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | EE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | EE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | EE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101045723 (NINGBO INST TECH ZHEJIANG UNIV [CN]) [X] 1-7 * page 4 *; | [A] - HIGUCHI HIROYUKI ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND PROPERTIES OF .ALPHA.,.OMEGA.-DISUBSTITUTED OLIGO(3-HEXYLTHIOPHENE)S AND OLIGOTHIENOQUINONOIDS IN HEAD-TO-HEAD ORIENTATION", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19950101), vol. 68, no. 8, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 2363 - 2377, XP008070697 [A] 1-7 * page 2373; example 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.68.2363 | by applicant | CN101045723 | - BURRELL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), page 8974 | - HIGUCHI HIROYUKI ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1995), vol. 68, no. 8, pages 2363 - 2377 |