EP2107417 - Design method of aspheric ophthalmic lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi Aichi 443-0038 / JP | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isogai, Aki c/o Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0038 / JP | 02 /
Taki, Seiji c/o Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0038 / JP | 03 /
Nakahata, Yoshihiro c/o Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0038 / JP | 04 /
Sunada, Tsutomu c/o Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0038 / JP | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156602.6 | 30.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | JP20080091764 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008091764 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107417 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04, A61F2/16 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
G02C7/04 (EP);
A61F2/164 (EP);
G02C7/028 (EP);
G02C2202/04 (EP);
G02C2202/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/24] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gestaltungsverfahren für eine asphärische opthalmische Linse | [2009/41] | English: | Design method of aspheric ophthalmic lens | [2009/41] | French: | Procédé de conception de lentille ophtalmique asphérique | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 08.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2010 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007128423 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 19 * * page 7, line 35 - page 11, line L; figures 1-13 *; | DE102006021521 [ ] (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]); | [X]EP1329206 (EURO LENS TECHNOLOGY S P A [IT]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1857077 (ALCON MFG LTD [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-16B * | [X] - LIOU L H ET AL, "Anatomically accurate, finite model eye for optical modeling", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA A, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19970801), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 1084-7529, pages 1684 - 1695, XP008082210 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * page 1688, column R, line 16 - line 34; figure 4 * | by applicant | WO2007128423 |