EP2141750 - Method of light induced plating on semiconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamm, Gary 4 Fox Hill Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 02 /
Jacques, David J. / 51 Freedom's Way Northbridge, MA 01752 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Hamm, Gary 4 Fox Hill Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | ||
02 /
Jacques, David J. 51 Freedom's Way Northbridge, MA 01752 / US | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/01] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09156612.5 | 30.03.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | US20080133765P | 02.07.2008 Original published format: US 133765 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141750 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2141750 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141750 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, H01L31/0224, H01L21/288, C25D5/02 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
C23C18/143 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1651 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1667 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1692 (EP,US);
H01L21/02623 (KR);
H01L31/18 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,US);
C25D5/625 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H01L31/18, H01L21/288 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/28] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur lichtinduzierten Plattierung auf Halbleitern | [2010/01] | English: | Method of light induced plating on semiconductors | [2010/01] | French: | Procédé de placage induit par la lumière sur des semi-conducteurs | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 12.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4251327 (GRENON LAWRENCE A) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 41 *; | [A]US5011565 (DUBE CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]US5543333 (HOLDERMANN KONSTANTIN [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 59 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 53 - page 7, line 30 *; | [A]EP1865563 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A] - METTE A ET AL, "Increasing the Efficiency of Screen-Printed Silicon Solar Cells by Light-Induced Silver Plating", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2006 IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION (IEEE CAT. NO.06CH37747),, (20060501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0016-4, pages 1056 - 1059, XP031007489 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3041255 | US5543333 |