EP2107148 - Laundry treating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Hea Kyung LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dong Won LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Hong, Sog Kie LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Park, Dae Yun LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kim, Jong Seok LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Yoo, Hea Kyung LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Dong Won LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Hong, Sog Kie LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Dae Yun LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Jong Seok LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09156729.7 | 30.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | KR20080030388 | 01.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080030388 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107148 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107148 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F25/00, D06F58/20, D06F73/02, D06F39/00 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
D06F58/203 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/44 (KR);
D06F39/40 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/10 (KR);
D06F73/02 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/62 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/37] |
Former [2010/24] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wäschebehandlungsmaschine | [2009/41] | English: | Laundry treating machine | [2009/41] | French: | Machine de traitement du linge | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 23.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.09.2018 | GB | 30.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/21] | IT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4432489 (SCHLATTL ALICE [DE]) [Y] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [X]WO03074778 (CEVIK AYLA [TR]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE10260151 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 5-11; | [A]EP1441059 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO2006091057 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 9 * the whole document * [A] 1-8,10-15; | [A]WO2006100335 (IBAI S COOP [ES], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1734170 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10; | [XA]WO2007145451 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-6,8-11; | [XA]WO2008010670 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-11; | [XA]WO2008030053 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 4-11; | [PX]EP1936023 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1-3,12-15 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1548177 | EP1900868 | WO2009020313 | WO2009020328 | WO2009020327 |