EP2131331 - Franking method based on the mail category [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farlotti, Laurent 6, rue Epervière 49080, PRUNIERS / FR | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09156819.6 | 31.03.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | FR20080053655 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0853655 | [2009/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131331 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131331 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0058 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00685 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/33] |
Former [2009/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frankierverfahren in Abhängigkeit von der Kategorie der Post | [2009/50] | English: | Franking method based on the mail category | [2009/50] | French: | Procédé d'affranchissement en fonction de la catégorie de courrier | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 10.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002198852 (FREEMAN GERALD C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 27 *; | [A]WO2004021287 (US POSTAL SERVICE [US]) [A] 1-11* page 12, paragraph 46 - paragraph 48 *; | [A]EP1450310 (NEOPOST IND [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 10 * * page 5, paragraph 24 *; | [A]FR2881549 (NEOPOST IND SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 14 * * page 4, line 30 - line 32 *; | [A]EP1777660 (ASCOM HASLER MAILING SYS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 9 - paragraph 13 * * page 6, paragraph 36 - page 7, paragraph 37 * | by applicant | US7098410 |