EP2114014 - Systems and methods for iterative data detection and/or decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Shaohua 4235 Voltaire Street Santa Clara, CA 95135 / US | 02 /
Zhong, Hao 1517 Woodmeadow Court San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 03 /
Tan, Weijun 4123 Ravenna Place Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 04 /
Rauschmayer, Richard 2006 Prestwick Court Longmont, CO 80501 / US | 05 /
Xing Yuan, Lee 3346 Einstein Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Yang, Shaohua 4235 Voltaire Street Santa Clara, CA 95135 / US | ||
02 /
Zhong, Hao 1517 Woodmeadow Court San Jose, CA 95131 / US | |||
03 /
Tan, Weijun 4123 Ravenna Place Longmont, CO 80503 / US | |||
04 /
Rauschmayer, Richard 2006 Prestwick Court Longmont, CO 80501 / US | |||
05 /
Xing Yuan, Lee 3346 Einstein Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09156925.1 | 31.03.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | US20080114462 | 02.05.2008 Original published format: US 114462 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114014 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2114014 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114014 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H03M13/47, H03M13/00, H04L1/00, G11B20/18, // H03M13/11, H03M13/15, H03M13/09, H03M13/27, H03M13/39, H03M13/41 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
H03M13/07 (KR);
H03M13/09 (EP,KR,US);
H03M13/27 (EP,US);
H03M13/2987 (EP,US);
H03M13/6331 (EP,US);
H03M13/6337 (EP,US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
G11B2020/185 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2516 (EP,US);
H03M13/1102 (EP,US);
H03M13/1111 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | H03M13/29, H03M13/47, H04L1/00, G11B20/18, // H03M13/11, H03M13/15, H03M13/09, H03M13/27, H03M13/39, H03M13/41 | ||
Former IPC [2009/45] | H03M13/47, // H03M13/11, H03M13/15, H03M13/09, H03M13/27, H03M13/39, H03M13/41 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/34] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur iterativen Datendetektion und/oder -decodierung | [2009/45] | English: | Systems and methods for iterative data detection and/or decoding | [2009/45] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour la détection et/ou le décodage itératifs de données | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 15.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001017904 (PUKKILA MARKKU [FI], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 24] - [0025] - [0 28] - [0032] - [0 35]; figures 1,2,3 *; | [Y]WO2008015742 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figures 1,5 *; | EP2048790 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US2006265634 (SILVUS GREGORY L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AP] - GUNNAM K K ET AL, "Next generation iterative LDPC solutions for magnetic recording storage", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 2008 42ND ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081026), ISBN 978-1-4244-2940-0, pages 1148 - 1152, XP031475470 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ZINING WU ET AL, "Equation Based LDPC Decoder for Intersymbol Interference Channels", 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING - 18-23 MARCH 2005 - PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20050318), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2005.1416414, ISBN 978-0-7803-8874-1, pages 757 - 760, XP010792947 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2005.1416414 | by applicant | US2001017904 | WO2008015742 |