EP2108850 - Corner joint, in particular for metal-free bed frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhn, Heino Obersuhler Str. 4 99837 Dankmarshausen / DE | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2009/42] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09157460.8 | 07.04.2009 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | DE20081018692 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008018692 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108850 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2108850 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108850 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47C19/02, F16B12/48, F16B12/22, F16B12/54, A47C19/00 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F16B12/48 (EP);
A47C19/005 (EP);
A47C19/021 (EP);
A47C19/045 (EP);
F16B12/22 (EP);
F16B12/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | F16B12/46, A47C19/00, F16B12/22, F16B12/54 | ||
Former IPC [2009/42] | F16B12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Eckverbindung, insbesondere für metallfreie Bettgestelle | [2009/42] | English: | Corner joint, in particular for metal-free bed frames | [2009/42] | French: | Liaison d'angle, notamment pour châssis de lit sans métal | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 20.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2009 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MK | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3619868 (INTER IKEA AS [DK]) [Y] 7-9 * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]GB2240375 (GAUCI MARTIN) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9208007U (HÄFELE GMBH & CO.) [A] 4* figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]EP1835184 (WEYRAUCH RALF [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0056] * * claims 1-3 * | by applicant | GB489816 | DE29701033U | EP1835184 |