EP2112467 - Method and device for fluorescent immersion range scanning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hullin, Matthias Robert-Koch-Str. 44 66125, Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Fuchs, Martin Schweringstr. 21 66113, Saarbrücken / DE | 03 /
Ihrke, Ivo 2764 West 14th Ave Vancouver British Columbia V6H 2Z2 / CA | 04 /
Lensch, Hendrick Rotenbergstr. 19 66111, Saarbrücken / DE | 05 /
Seidel, Hans-Peter Beim Franzosengrab 1 66386, St. Ingbert / DE | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Bach, Alexander, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Bach, Alexander, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Bach, Alexander, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09157485.5 | 07.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | US20080071300P | 21.04.2008 Original published format: US 71300 P | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2112467 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2112467 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
G01B11/2504 (EP,US);
G01B11/2518 (EP,US);
G06T7/521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fluoreszenzimmersionsbereichsabtastung (Fluorescent Immersion Range Scanning) | [2009/44] | English: | Method and device for fluorescent immersion range scanning | [2009/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de balayage de champ à immersion fluorescente | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]WO2007029038 (SLD LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,2 * page 1, lines 3-6; claims 1,2,21,23 * [A] 7,11-14 [Y] 3-6,8-10; | [XAI]US6088105 (LINK HANS-JOERG [DE]) [X] 11 * claims 1,13,18 * [A] 1-10,14 [I] 12,13; | [IA]US2003198374 (HAGENE JON KRISTIAN [NO], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-14 | [YDA] - IHRKE I ET AL, "Reconstructing the Geometry of Flowing Water", COMPUTER VISION, 2005. ICCV 2005. TENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 17-20 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20051017), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ICCV.2005.202, ISBN 978-0-7695-2334-7, pages 1055 - 1060, XP010856933 [YD] 3-6,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,7,11-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2005.202 | by applicant | - BLAIS, F., "Review of 20 Years of Range Sensor Development", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC IMAGING, (2004), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 231 - 243 | - CURLESS, B. ET AL., "Better Optical Triangulation through Spacetime Analysis", PROC. OF ICCV'95, (1995), pages 987 - 994 | - TRUCCO; FISHER, "Acquisition of Consistent Range Data Using Local Calibration", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, (1994), pages 3410 - 3415 | - CHEN ET AL., "Polarization and Phase-Shifting for 3D Scanning of Translucent Objects", PROC. OF CVPR '06, (2007), pages 17 - 22 | - CLARK ET AL., "Using Light Polarization in Laser Scanning", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, (1997), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 107 - 117 | - PARK ET AL., "Specularity Elimination in Range Sensing for Accurate 3D Modeling of Specular Objects", PROCEEDINGS OF 3DPVT'04, pages 707 - 714 | - "3D Modeling of Optically Challenging Objects", IEEE TRANS. ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, vol. 14, no. 2, pages 246 - 262 | - MURASE, "Surface Shape Reconstruction of a Nonri- gid Transparent Object Using Refraction and Motion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1992), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 1045 - 1052 | - MORRIS; KUTULAKOS, "Dynamic Refraction Stereo", PROC. OF ICCV'05, pages 1573 - 15802005 | - KUTULAKOS; STEGER, "A Theory of Refractive and Specular 3D Shape by Light-Path Triangulation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2008), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 13 - 29 | - IHRKE ET AL., "Reconstructing the Geometry of Flowing Water", PROC. OF ICCV'05, (2005), pages 1055 - 1060 | - BEN-EZRA, M. ET AL., "What Does Motion Reveal About Transparency", PROC. OF ICCV'03, vol. 2, pages 1025 - 1032 | - NARASIMHAN ET AL., "Structured Light in Scattering Media", PROC. OF ICCV'05, (2005), pages 420 - 427 | - DEUSCH, S.; DRACOS, T., "Time resolved 3d passive scalar concentration-field imaging by laser induced fluorescence in moving liquids", MEAS. SCI. TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, pages 188 - 200 | - HAWKINS ET AL., "Acquisition of Time-Varying Participating Media", PROC. OF ACM SIGGRAPH, (2005), pages 812 - 815 | - FUCHS ET AL., "Density Estimation for Dynamic Volumes", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, (2007), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 205 - 211 |