EP2239658 - Custom command line switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borriello, Diego Via San Francisco, 2 16040, Cogorno / IT | 02 /
Camera, Fabrizio Via Rossini 13 15069, Serravalle Scrivia / IT | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Kley, Hansjörg Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09157565.4 | 08.04.2009 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239658 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
G06F9/45512 (EP,US);
G06F8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Benutzergesteuerter Stromschalter | [2010/41] | English: | Custom command line switch | [2010/41] | French: | Commutateur de ligne de commande personnalisé | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004158621 (REYNA DAVID [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] *; | [X]US2005156925 (FONG RYAN P [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2008295110 (MUSCARELLA FABRIZIO [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9637825 (BULL HN INFORMATION SYST [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |