EP2238839 - Multiple texture food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraft Foods R & D, Inc. Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [2014/29] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Kraft Foods R & D, Inc. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093-2753 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kortum, Olaf Karl-Huber-Straße 2a 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
Ramstoetter, Richard Plereit 6 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | 03 /
Wibisono, Patricia Kemalasari Niederalmstraße 6B 81735 München / DE | 04 /
Hoffmann, Jelena Seydlitz Straße 55 80993 München / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
Kortum, Olaf Karl-Huber-Straße 2a 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
02 /
Ramstoetter, Richard Plereit 6 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | |||
03 /
Wibisono, Patricia Kemalasari Niederalmstraße 6B 81735 München / DE | |||
04 /
Hoffmann, Jelena Seydlitz Straße 55 80993 München / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2010/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09157710.6 | 09.04.2009 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238839 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238839 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/076, A23C19/082, A23C19/084, A23C19/09, A23L1/00 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A23C19/0765 (EP,US);
A21D13/10 (EP,US);
A23C19/082 (EP,US);
A23C19/084 (EP,US);
A23C19/0908 (EP,US);
A23P30/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittel mit mehreren Texturen | [2010/41] | English: | Multiple texture food | [2010/41] | French: | Aliment à plusieurs textures | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2009 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | LU | 09.04.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.04.2009 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS55144853 (TAKANASHI NIYUUGIYOU KK) [X] 1,3,5,9,11,13-15 * abstract * [I] 2,4,6-8,10,12; | [XI]UA14374U (MUSHKETER MUSKETEER LTD LIABIL [UA]) [X] 1,9-10,13-14 * abstract * [I] 2-8,11-12,15; | [X]FR2769471 (BEL FROMAGERIES [FR]) [X] 9-15 * example 2 *; | [X]US4948613 (BERNARD JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [X] 9-15 * example 3 *; | [XI]DE3314551 (UNILEVER NV) [X] 9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [XI]DE2262184 (PICON FROMAGERIES) [X] 9,11-15 * page 6 - page 7 * [I] 10; | [XI]DE19914230 (HOCHLAND REICH [DE]) [X] 9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [X]DE19962780 (HOCHLAND REICH [DE]) [X] 9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [X]RU2151518 ; | [A]US3828660 (MUELLER M, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 54, line 19 - line 41; figures 84-87 * | [X] - THAKUR; VIAL R K; CH DJELVEH; G, "Effect of composition and process parameters on elasticity and solidity of foamed food", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING AND PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20080107), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0255-2701, pages 474 - 483, XP022411492 [X] 9,11-15 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.2]; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cep.2007.01.019 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 66, Database accession no. 2000-678060, XP002546034 & RU2151518 C1 20000627 (ARTEMOV V N) [X] 9-11,13-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US4795650 | US3966970 | WO2007042096 | EP0818149 |