EP2110703 - Retarder-based despeckle device and method for laser illumination systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/43] | Retarder-based despeckle device for laser illumination systems | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Corporation 430 N. McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tan, Kim L. 2949 Edgewater Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95407 / US | 02 /
Shemo, David M. 1168 Mitchell Lane Windsor, CA 95492 / US | 03 /
Mceldowney, Scott 172 Monika Court Windsor, CA 95492 / US | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Walker, Stephen Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Walker, Stephen Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09157801.3 | 10.04.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | US20080045012P | 15.04.2008 Original published format: US 45012 P | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110703 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110703 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/48, H04N9/31, // G02B27/28 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
G02B27/48 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/18 (KR);
H04N9/3126 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US);
G02B27/286 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | Auf einem Wellenlängenplättchen basierende Vorrichtung und Methode zur Reduzierung von Speckles in Laserbeleuchtungssystemen | [2010/03] | English: | Retarder-based despeckle device and method for laser illumination systems | [2010/03] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de réduction de granularité à base de lame de retardement pour systèmes d'éclairage laser | [2010/03] |
Former [2009/43] | Auf einem Wellenlängenplättchen basierende Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung von Speckles in Laserbeleuchtungssystemen | ||
Former [2009/43] | Retarder-based despeckle device for laser illumination systems | ||
Former [2009/43] | Dispositif de réduction de granularité à base de lame de retardement pour systèmes d'éclairage laser | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HR | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MK | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | PT | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | NO | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | IE | 10.04.2011 | LU | 10.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
HR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
NO | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0062114 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [A]US2004008399 (TRISNADI JAHJA I [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] * * paragraph [0054] * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2006023164 (SAKAGUCHI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0036] *; | [AD] - TRISNADI J I, "SPECKLE CONTRAST REDUCTION IN LASER PROJECTION DISPLAYS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (20020101), vol. 4657, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 131 - 137, XP002329078 [AD] 1,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.463781 | by applicant | US3633999 | US4511220 | US6323984 | US6747781 | - L. WANG ET AL., "Speckle reduction in laser projection systems by diffractive optical element", APPL. OPT., (1998), vol. 37, pages 177 - 1775 | - J.W. GOODMAN, "Some fundamental properties of speckles", J. OPT. SOC. AMER. A, (1976), vol. 66, pages 1145 - 1150 | - "Speckle contrast reduction in laser projection displays", J.I. TRISNADI, Projection Displays VIII, Proc. SPIE 4657, SOC. PHOTO-OPT. INSTRU. ENGRS., (2002), pages 131 - 137 |