Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2199853 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2199853



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 97
05.04.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.03.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
22.12.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.05.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.03.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.03.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
23.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
28.06.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.05.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.05.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.05.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
18.05.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
06.05.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
06.05.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.05.2009 Priority document Search / examination 30
30.04.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.04.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.04.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.04.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.04.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
10.04.2009 Description Search / examination 7
10.04.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2009 Drawings Search / examination 6
10.04.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4