blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2199853

EP2199853 - Collimated visual display with elliptical front projection screen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Barco NV
President Kennedypark 35
8500 Kortrijk / BE
[2010/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Oren, Moshe
BARCO N.V. 2795 Mulligan Way
Beavercreek, OH 45431 / US
 [2010/25]
Representative(s)IPLodge bv
Technologielaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]De Baere, Ivo
IPLodge bvba
Technologielaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
Former [2010/25]Bird, William Edward
Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Application number, filing date09157819.510.04.2009
[2010/25]
Priority number, dateUS2008027305318.11.2008         Original published format: US 273053
[2010/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2199853
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:G03B21/28, H04N5/74
[2010/25]
CPC:
G03B21/28 (EP,US); G09B9/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kollimierte visuelle Anzeige mit ellipsenförmigem Frontprojektionsschirm[2010/25]
English:Collimated visual display with elliptical front projection screen[2010/25]
French:Affichage visuel collimaté avec écran de projection avant elliptique[2010/25]
Examination procedure23.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/17]
22.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201709   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006232853  (DOBSCHAL HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US6046857  (MORISHIMA HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US5214540  (YAKIMOVSKY YORAM [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 21 - line 44 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]US2004070839  (YAGI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5436763  (CHEN CHUNGTE W [US], et al) [A] 8 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.