EP2113408 - Vehicular cooling device supporting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50, Hosoya-cho 4-chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8507 / JP | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obayashi, Akira c/o TOYODA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 4-50, Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8507 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Akiyoshi c/o TOYODA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 4-50, Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8507 / JP | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09158049.8 | 16.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | JP20080117792 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008117792 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113408 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113408 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung einer Fahrzeugkühlvorrichtung | [2009/45] | English: | Vehicular cooling device supporting apparatus | [2009/45] | French: | Appareil prenant en charge un dispositif de refroidissement de véhicule | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | BE | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HR | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | MK | 02.03.2011 | MT | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | IE | 16.04.2011 | LU | 16.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | NO | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
LU | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
LU | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 02.03.2011 | |
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4770234 (HIRAOKA KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1398199 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004331002 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006256461 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [DA]EP1726470 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-7* the whole document * |