Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010271794 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158551 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101873003B | Global Dossier | 27.03.2013 | B | CN101873003 | 27.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09158551 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244544 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2011 | B1 | EP2244544 | 27.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158551 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE531245T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09158551 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2375818T | 06.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09158551 | 23.04.2009 |