EP2113666 - Hydraulic fluid supply device and electrical actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nabtesco Corporation 9-18 Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Naohiro c/o Gifu Plant Nabtesco Corporation 1110-1, Miyashiro Tarui-cho, Fuwa-gun Gifu 503-2124 / JP | [2019/48] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Makino, Naohiro c/o Gifu Plant Nabtesco Corporation 1110-1, Miyashiro Tarui-cho, Fuwa-gun Gifu 503-2124 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/45] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09158959.8 | 28.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | JP20080116716 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008116716 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2113666 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2113666 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113666 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
F04B49/002 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20553 (EP,US);
F15B2211/26 (EP,US);
F15B2211/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Druckmittelversorgung und elektrischer Aktuator | [2009/45] | English: | Hydraulic fluid supply device and electrical actuator | [2009/45] | French: | Alimentation en fluide hydraulique et actionneur électrique | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2009 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | GB | 28.04.2020 | IE | 28.04.2020 | LU | 28.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.04.2009 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
GB | 28.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
GB | 28.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
GB | 28.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001295802 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE10128584 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]JP2005036870 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2005024246 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * figure 1 *; | [XA]JP2005240974 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,10 * figures 5,16 * [A] 3,7,8; | [X]JP2006300187 (KAWASAKI PRECISION MACH LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2007114339 (YUKEN KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-8 *; | [XP]US2008236156 (KAKINO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-10* paragraph [0030]; figures 1,7 * | by applicant | JP2002054604 |