EP2141513 - Device and method for measuring a beam area of a particle beam and assembly for creating a particle beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacher Platz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rietzel, Eike Rhönring 60 64289, Darmstadt / DE | [2010/01] | Application number, filing date | 09159596.7 | 07.05.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | DE20081029609 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008029609 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141513 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G01T1/2935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Vermessung eines Strahlflecks eines Partikelstrahls sowie Anlage zur Erzeugung eines Partikelstrahls | [2010/01] | English: | Device and method for measuring a beam area of a particle beam and assembly for creating a particle beam | [2010/01] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de mesure d'une tâche de rayonnement d'un rayon de particules et installation de production d'un rayon de particules | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |