EP2248581 - Process for quenching the effluent gas of a furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viennet, Dominique 17, rue des Hautes-Hurées 1400 Nivelles / BE | 02 /
Platvoet, Erwin 11920 East Apache Tulsa, OK 74116 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Neel, Henry Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Neel, Henry Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 09159742.7 | 08.05.2009 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248581 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B01J19/24, C10G9/00, C10G9/20 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
B01J19/0053 (EP);
B01F25/43195 (EP);
B01F25/431971 (EP);
B01J19/2405 (EP);
B01J19/2425 (EP);
C10G9/002 (EP);
C10G9/20 (EP);
F28D7/00 (EP);
F28F13/12 (EP);
B01J2219/00772 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Dämpfen von Abgasen eines Brennofens | [2010/45] | English: | Process for quenching the effluent gas of a furnace | [2010/45] | French: | Processus de refroidissement des gaz émis d'un four | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2008033193 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-12 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0022] , [0032] , [0034] , [0036] - [0039] - [0049] * * page 5, line 20 - line 23 * * page 6, line 11 - line 13 * * page 7, line 16 - line 30 * * page 7, line 28 - line 30 *; | [X]WO2004083705 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 25, line 15 - line 29 *; | [A]US4809415 (OKAYAMA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 1 - line 13 * | by applicant | US4457364 | US3671198 | WO2008033193 | EP1561795 |