EP2248412 - Round baler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viaud, Jean / 6, Rue Docteur Prieur 70100, Gray / FR | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Viaud, Jean 6, Rue Docteur Prieur 70100, Gray / FR | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09159827.6 | 08.05.2009 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248412 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248412 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08, A01F15/07 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A01F15/07 (EP,US);
A01F15/0833 (EP,US);
A01F2015/077 (EP,US);
A01F2015/0775 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | A01F15/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Rundballenpresse | [2010/45] | English: | Round baler | [2010/45] | French: | Roto-presse | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | MK | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MK | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004042935 (SACHT HANS OTTO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,2 *; | [DX]DE102004002976 (DEERE & CO [US]) [DX] 1,2,4,8 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figure 2 *; | [X]US3901007 (BLANSHINE ALLISON W, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * sentence 7, paragraph 49 - sentence 12, paragraph 48; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE4105078 | EP1595483 | DE102004002976 |