EP2120304 - Apparatus and method for an electrical system enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pillips, James Quentin 6801 Industrial Drive Mebane, NC 27302 / US | 02 /
Manchuri, Dwaraka Nadha Reddy Varanasi Vari Palli, Yerra Vari Palem, Chittoor, Andhra 517194 Pradesh / IN | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09159831.8 | 08.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | US20080120125 | 13.05.2008 Original published format: US 120125 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120304 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2120304 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/24 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H02B11/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für eine elektrische Zelle | [2009/47] | English: | Apparatus and method for an electrical system enclosure | [2009/47] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour enceinte de système électrique | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6414839 (DERKSEN JAMES S [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 45; figure - *; | [X]EP0061129 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4486815 (TAKAHASHI MASARU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figure -; claims 1-7 *; | [X]DE9005066U (KLÖCKNER MOELLER GMBH) [X] 1-15 * figure - * |